Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Public School Facility Construction Innovation Incentive Pilot Program to provide incentives to encourage public school systems to pursue innovative public school facility construction projects; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to implement, administer, and promote the Incentive Program; requiring the Interagency Commission to approve a project that meets a certain cost threshold for participation in the Incentive Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0968
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2017
Legislative Date
10/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {699032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2017 10/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {699032/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Text - Third - Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (41-2) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504966/1 Adopted 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text - Chapter - Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM