Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third Span
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Explicitly stating the power of the Maryland Transportation Authority to conduct or coordinate a study of the environmental impact of a proposed transportation facility; requiring the Authority, in collaboration with specified other agencies, to commence the process, on or before January 1, 2014, to conduct and complete an Environmental Impact Study for a third crossing of the Chesapeake Bay; and requiring that the Environmental Impact Study be for a span at a specified location.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0818 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2013 1/10/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/10/2013 1/10/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2013 1/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/14/2013 1/14/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM