Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Forehand, Jacobs, Klausmeier, Mathias, Raskin, Robey, Stone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding immunity from civil liability or criminal penalty to a person who provides or participates in providing notice of child abuse or neglect to the appropriate authorities; requiring the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner to send an autopsy report to specified officials if the office finds a death investigated by the office was caused by or related to child abuse or neglect; making it a misdemeanor for a specified person to knowingly and willfully fail to make a specified report of abuse under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0063 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2013 1/10/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-602.2 )
(   5-704, 5-705.2, 5-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM