Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services Costs
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Raskin, Young, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of specified governmental units to adopt a fee structure to cover specified costs for system services; altering a specified definition for the purpose of repealing the authority of specified governmental units to adopt a fee structure to cover specified costs relating to existing system products; authorizing specified governmental units to adopt a fee structure for system products that includes an additional charge of not more than $50; repealing a specified requirement; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0353
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514039/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {736781/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {514039/1 Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {736781/1 Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-901 through 10-904, 10-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM