Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law do not prohibit insurance producers from charging and collecting from insureds actual expenses incurred by the insurance producer for payment of the premium for a policy by use of a credit card, subject to specified conditions; requiring an insurance producer, under specified circumstances, to fully disclose the availability of all acceptable payment methods and any charge for actual expenses incurred; providing that specified credit card expenses may not be considered premium under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0800
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713399/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {647772/1 Adopted 12
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Text - Third - Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Referred Economic Matters 16
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {713399/1 Adopted 55
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text - Chapter - Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM