Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding "pigeon" to the defined term "unprotected bird" for the purposes of the wildlife and hunting laws of the State; prohibiting a person from engaging in certain activity while hunting or pursuing unprotected birds or mammals; prohibiting a person from conducting or participating in an organized contest for prizes or monetary awards for which unprotected birds are launched by mechanical or manual means as targets for the contest participants; providing a fine of $25 for each unprotected bird killed in violation of the Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2017
Legislative Date
10/19/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Unprotected Birds - Pigeons
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Unprotected Birds - Pigeons
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {820214/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2017 10/19/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Unprotected Birds - Pigeons
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {264338/1 Adopted 14
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Unprotected Birds - Pigeons
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 16
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 17
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {820214/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-401, 10-424 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM