Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for golf carts on Upper or Middle Hoopers Island; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway on Upper or Middle Hoopers Island may operate the golf cart only on highways on which the maximum speed does not exceed 30 miles per hour between dawn and dusk and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; requiring a person who operates a golf cart to keep as far to the right as feasible; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0023
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2019
Legislative Date
10/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2019 10/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM