Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training, Quality Assurance, and Employee Safety
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Comptroller)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Comptroller of the State to monitor and record specified incoming telephone calls to employees of the Comptroller's call centers for training, quality assurance, and employee safety purposes; prohibiting the Comptroller from recording or monitoring calls to or from direct individual lines in the Office of the Comptroller; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0068 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759937/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-18)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/13/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {759937/1 Report Adopted 17A
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17A
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 22
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (116-18) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM