Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Workers' Compensation Children's Scholarship Fund; requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission to impose, in addition to payment of specified compensation, a $5000 assessment against an employer or its insurer per award of compensation; providing that assessments under the Act shall be paid to the Fund; authorizing the Joint Committee on Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight to award specified scholarship assistance to individuals who meet specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0237
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
(   10-401 through 10-403, 9-751 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page