Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain meetings of a council of unit owners of a condominium or a homeowners association to be held on less than 30 days of notice; requiring certain meeting notices for condominiums and homeowners associations to include a copy of the proposed agenda for the meeting; prohibiting certain receivers from voting on behalf of certain condominium unit owners or homeowners association lot owners; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2018
Legislative Date
1/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2018 1/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109, 11-109.4, 11-110, 11-116, 11-130.1, 11B-111.4, 11B-112, 11B-112.3, 11B-115.2, 11B-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM