Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire and Bailey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Changing the name of the Recreational License Donation Fund to the Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund; extending the termination date for certain provisions of law establishing the recreational license donation program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {404132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {360111/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Recreational License Donation Program - Program Extension and Monetary Donations via Electronic Licensing
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {404132/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Revisions
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {360111/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM