Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain investor-owned gas, electric, or combination gas and electric companies to require certain contractors and subcontractors to pay their employees not less than the prevailing wage rate for certain projects involving the construction, reconstruction, installation, demolition, restoration, or alteration of any underground gas or electric infrastructure of the company, and any related traffic control activities.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0174
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1011 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page