Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Carter, Ferguson, Hayes, McCray, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring Baltimore City to withhold from tax sale certain places of worship if the taxes on the property consist only of a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service; repealing the authority of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to sell certain properties to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service if the properties are also being sold to enforce another lien; repealing a certain authority to sell certain real property owned by religious groups or organizations; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {529233/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {529233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {529233/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {529233/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Ways and Means 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
(   14-811, 14-849.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page