Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the date on which a third party administrator's registration expires; increasing the period of time during which a third party administrator may reinstate an expired registration from 3 months to 1 year; increasing the amount of the reinstatement fee a person whose third party administrator's registration has expired is required to pay to $100; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/09/2019
Legislative Date
9/09/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/09/2019 9/09/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM