Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Child Support
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Eckardt, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, subject to certain conditions, a court order to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found by clear and convincing evidence to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent resulting in the conception of a child does not affect the individual's responsibility to pay child support; providing that a parent may not bring an action for child support against a person whose parental rights have been terminated under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Child Support
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Child Support
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM