Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Disabilities - Assistive Technology Loan Program - Board of Directors
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Disabilities)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that at least one of the four members of the Assistive Technology Loan Program Board of Directors, who must have disabilities or assist individuals with disabilities, also be a member of the Maryland Commission on Disabilities; providing for the staggering of terms of Board members; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
9/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997876/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 9/24/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {997876/1 Report Adopted 12
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 14
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 15
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-601, 7-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM