Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Reilly, Beidle, and Patterson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding certain counties to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings used for agritourism from certain building performance standards; and exempting a building used for agritourism in certain counties from a building permit requirement under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0639
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714630/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714630/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {373527/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {714630/1 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 34
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {714630/1 Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {373527/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 40
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM