Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the day on which interest begins to accrue on specified taxpayer refunds from the 45th day after a refund claim is filed to the date the overpayment is made; allowing interest to accrue on a taxpayer refund from the 45th day after the claim is filed if the claim for a refund is based on an error or mistake of the claimant not attributable to the State; repealing a specified prohibition on a tax collector paying interest on specified refunds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0205
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2013 1/11/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM