Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Getty, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that self-defense can qualify as a good and substantial reason to wear, carry, or transport a handgun for purposes of the issuance by the Secretary of State Police of a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0767
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0729 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM