Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Beidle, Cassilly, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Hester, Salling, and Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Court Dog and Child Witness Program; providing the Program is in the circuit court of each county that participates; providing participation in the Program is voluntary; establishing the purpose of the Program; requiring participating courts to adhere to rules adopted by the Administrative Office of the Courts; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop a plan to implement the Program; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to establish standards for participants in the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0311
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/17/2019
Legislative Date
10/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/17/2019 10/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2016, 2017, 2019 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM