Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Use of Alternate Care Sites During a State of Emergency - Authorization
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to promulgate specified orders, rules, or regulations to authorize the use of specified alternate care sites by licensed health care facilities that have access to an emergency electrical power generator to provide medical services, nursing services, or other health-related services during a declared state of emergency: etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284834/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {596785/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2014 1/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Favorable with Amendments {284834/1 Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 14
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {596785/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 58
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-301, 14-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM