Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0102


CH0526

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the Maryland Department of Health has the authority to change the name on a birth certificate without a court order to allow the Department, if only one parent is named on the birth certificate of the child, to change the name on receipt of certain documents from the parent named on the birth certificate; and providing that only one affidavit signed by both parents named on the birth certificate is required under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2019
Legislative Date
9/24/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-2)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2019 9/24/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable Adopted 15
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Second Reading Passed 15
Text - Third - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 18
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-2) 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/16/2020 4:19 PM