Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law that relate to trapping or shooting specified foxes or shooting or molesting specified hounds in St. Mary's County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0187
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
(   54-1, 54-2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page