Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the Classroom
Sponsored by
Senators Benson and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the Classroom; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/19/2017
Legislative Date
7/19/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/19/2017 7/19/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the Classroom
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM