Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a critical incident stress management team member from disclosing certain communications or information acquired from a law enforcement officer, a correctional officer, or an emergency responder in the course of providing critical incident stress management services; prohibiting a critical incident stress management team member from being compelled to testify in any judicial or administrative proceeding or any investigation by a governmental unit; establishing certain exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0822 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM