Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Preparation and Filing Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the period of time, from 72 hours to 5 calendar days after a birth occurs, within which specified persons must prepare and file a birth certificate with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, specified persons must provide specified information required on a birth certificate, and the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene must verify a birth; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/08/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
8
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/08/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 5
Senate 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 5
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 7
House 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 8
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM