Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - NE Maryland Waste Disposal Authority)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Changing the name of the Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority to be the Maryland Regional Resource Management Authority; authorizing the Authority to acquire, construct, reconstruct, rehabilitate, improve, maintain, equip, lease, repair, and operate a resource recovery park; requiring the Authority to utilize a specified zero waste hierarchy, to the extent practicable, under specified circumstances; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; defining specified terms; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764830/1
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/3 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764830/1
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Committee Amendment {764830/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {764830/3 Adopted
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 10/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 1/06/2016 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {764830/1 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Special Order until 2/3 (Senator Conway) Adopted 15
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {764830/1 16
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Committee Amendment {764830/1 Withdrawn 16
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Substitute Committee Amendment {764830/3 Adopted 16
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 18
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 19
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901, 3-903, 3-904, 3-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM