Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of revenue from the St. Mary's County fire tax; and altering the distribution of revenue from the St. Mary's County rescue tax.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0111
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM