Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Pinsky, Nathan-Pulliam, Bailey, Carozza, Ellis, Gallion, Kagan, Lam, Patterson, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "nonprofit training entity" for the purposes of the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program to include an entity that uses trained therapy horses for interaction with veterans; altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include veterans who receive treatment or care from a U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs or U.S. Department of Defense medical facility in the State; altering the duties of a nonprofit training entity selected under the Program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954535/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {954535/1 Adopted 19A
Senate 2/05/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19A
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 21
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text - Chapter - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Therapy Horses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM