Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Charitable Gaming Events - For-Profit and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing in Baltimore City a for-profit organization to hold a charitable gaming event with a specified nonprofit organization under specified conditions; authorizing a charitable gaming event to include card games, dice games, and roulette; requiring that a for-profit organization and nonprofit organization be issued a permit before conducting a charitable event; allowing permit holders to pay for specified goods and services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0204
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0603 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-501, 13-502, 13-505.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM