Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the recordation tax and the State transfer tax the transfer of real property between specified business entities as part of a specified reorganization; and applying the Act to instruments of writing recorded on or after July 1, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/10/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/10/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 17A
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed 17A
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 22
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-108, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM