Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing a reference to a specified public transportation provider in Carroll County from the definition of "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1167 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 23
Text - Third - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Judiciary 28
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM