Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing individuals to apply to the State Board for Professional Engineers or a designee of the Board to take the Fundamentals of Engineering examination in order to obtain an engineer-in-training certificate; repealing certain requirements relating to the examination; permitting an authorized official of the Board to sign an engineer-in-training certificate; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0201
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2017
Legislative Date
9/29/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
5
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
7
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2017 9/29/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 3
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 3
Text - Third - State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
Senate 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 5
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Referred Economic Matters 7
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Text - Chapter - State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM