Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education be elected and appointed, as specified; repealing provisions relating to a retention election for specified appointed members of the county board; establishing procedures for the election and appointment of members of the county board; providing for a nonpartisan election for specified members of the county board; providing for the termination of the terms of specified members of the county board; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0971
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0022 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-108, 3-110, 3-114, 3-2A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM