Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Hotels and Lodging or Rooming Houses - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the applicability to specified hotels and lodging or rooming houses of specified provisions of law concerning carbon monoxide alarms; altering a specified reference to a specified alarm device national standard; requiring specified hotels and lodging or rooming houses, on or after April 1, 2017, to install a specified carbon monoxide alarm on the wall of specified rooms and areas within the hotel or lodging or rooming house under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1075 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784630/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {800616/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-3)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {784630/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 53
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {800616/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-3) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1103, 12-1104, 12-1105, 12-1106, 9-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM