Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Higher Education Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the types of nursing positions that are eligible to receive grants from the Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
10/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/21/2015 10/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/21/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 14
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 14
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations 17
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM