Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Qualified Higher Education Expenses - Annual Limitation
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $2,500 to $5,000, the maximum amount allowed in a taxable year as a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for advance payments of certain qualified higher education expenses made by an account holder or a contributor under a Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer Prepaid College Trust contract; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Qualified Higher Education Expenses - Annual Limitation
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM