Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain commuting costs incurred by certain qualified individuals who reside outside a 5-mile radius of the nearest commuter rail station and commute a certain number of miles during the taxable year; providing for the calculation of the credit; making the credit refundable; requiring a qualified individual to submit an application to the Department of Transportation on or before January 31 of the calendar year following the taxable year during which the commuting costs were incurred; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM