Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - General Assembly Scholarships - Modification of Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Kittleman, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Senatorial and Delegate Scholarship Programs to require that the money appropriated under the programs be awarded by the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission; requiring the Office to ensure that the awards are distributed in a specified manner and that specified student populations are served; requiring the Office to adopt guidelines; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0229 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-114, 18-401 through 18-408, 18-501, 18-502, 18-503, 18-504, 18-505, 18-506, 18-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM