Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pest Control Compact - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Pest Control Compact; repealing provisions of law relating to the findings of the parties to the compact; repealing provisions of law relating to the Pest Control Insurance Fund; repealing provisions of law relating to the administration of the compact and Fund; repealing provisions of law relating to the establishment of advisory and technical committees under the compact; repealing provisions of law relating to the entry into force, withdrawal, and construction of the compact; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
10/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/21/2015 10/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/21/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 18
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-701 through 5-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM