Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a carrier to disclose protected health information to another carrier for case management and care coordination activities under certain circumstances; requiring any request for or disclosure of protected health information to comply with certain federal laws and regulations; requiring a carrier to provide a certain individual access to the records being disclosed on request; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {357574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {357574/1 Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 22
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1412 )
Last Updated: 6/16/2020 4:19 PM