Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Reilly, Salling, West, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which an applicant for a handgun permit is required to pay a certain fee to allow payment by electronic check, credit card, or a method of online payment approved by the Secretary of State Police.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {293228/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted (31-15)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {993922/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted (33-13)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {562018/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {562018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator McCray) Adopted 30
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Floor Amendment {293228/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted (31-15) 31
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Smith) Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Floor Amendment {993922/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted (33-13) 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 36
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Judiciary 38
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {562018/1 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Cardin) Adopted 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {562018/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 60
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM