Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring specified sellers to provide buyers of specified motor vehicles with a statement regarding the right of the buyer to cancel the sale and a description of how the buyer may return the motor vehicle; requiring specified sellers to provide buyers with a fully completed receipt or copy of a contract that pertains to a specified Internet sale and contains specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1324, 14-4001 through 14-4004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM