Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a local government may spend 100 percent of its future annual apportionment on development projects and capital renewal after it has exceeded its acquisition goals under Program Open Space; requiring the Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space and Agricultural Land Preservation to review the State's specified standard for land acquisition to determine if adjustments to the standard would encourage additional land acquisition; requiring a specified report by the Joint Committee; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {234132/1 Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Text - Third - Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Appropriations 23
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text - Chapter - Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM