Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Sale of Drug Paraphernalia to a Minor - Local Law Authorizing Business License Revocation for a Second or Subsequent Violation
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to adopt a local law that authorizes the county or municipal corporation to revoke or not renew the business license of an establishment for the second or subsequent conviction of an employee of the establishment if the violation involves selling or delivering drug paraphernalia to a minor and occurs on the property of the business establishment.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0610 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 18
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary 23
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM