Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Judiciary)
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Anne Arundel, Baltimore, Charles, Frederick, Harford, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties and Baltimore City; and increasing the number of resident judges of the District Court in District 5 (Prince George's County) and District 6 (Montgomery County).
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0074
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/14/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 1/30/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/30/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 First Reading Judiciary 32
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58A
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page