Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Out-of-State Fee - Waiver for Border State Residents
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the boards of trustees of community colleges with service areas that border other states to set an out-of-state fee for students who reside in out-of-state counties that border Maryland; requiring that this fee be more than the out-of-county fee paid by Maryland students; allowing this fee to be less than the out-of-state fee paid by specified out-of-state students; prohibiting students attending community colleges by paying this fee from being counted for the purposes of specified State aid to community colleges; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1587
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2017
Legislative Date
1/13/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2017 1/13/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Community Colleges - Out-of-State Fee - Waiver for Border State Residents
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed 22
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Out-of-State Fee - Waiver for Border State Residents
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Ways and Means 26
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Out-of-State Fee - Waiver for Border State Residents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-310, 16-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM