Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - New Licenses, Waivers, and License Transfers
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that an appointment to the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City made when the Senate is not in session be subject to the advice and consent of the Senate when the Senate next convenes; authorizing the Board to issue a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license to an applicant who holds or has applied for a Class 9 limited distillery license; providing that a certain Class D beer, wine, and liquor license may be transferred only to a certain license holder; authorizing the Board to waive certain restaurant requirements; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0151
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Transfers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653397/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Transfers
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {104235/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Waivers – License Transfers
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {653397/1 Adopted 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - New Licenses, Waivers, and License Transfers
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 750
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - New Licenses, Waivers, and License Transfers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-1604, 12-1609, 12-1706, 12-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM