Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the terms "alcohol production" and "agricultural alcohol production"; authorizing a local jurisdiction to adopt the definitions of "alcohol production" and "agricultural alcohol production" by local ordinance, resolution, law, or rule; and providing for the application of the Act to charter counties.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2020
Legislative Date
1/02/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Senate 1/02/2020 1/02/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 10
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 10
Text - Third - Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Referred Economic Matters 13
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-401,   4-213, 4-214 )
Last Updated: 1/24/2020 2:49 PM