Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations - Premium Tax and Transfer of Premium Tax Exemption Value - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Eckardt, and Hough
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a specified tax on premiums of for-profit health maintenance organizations; repealing provisions of law that require specified nonprofit health maintenance organizations to transfer funds in an amount equal to the value of a specified premium tax exemption to the Medical Assistance Program Account, require the funds to be allocated in a specified manner, and require the health maintenance organizations to file with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner a report establishing transfer of the funds; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-802, 19-807, 6-101, 6-102, 6-103, 6-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM